House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1097 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |