House
|
05/02/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1342
|
Journal Page: 2724
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2724
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2724
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2989
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2989
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1505
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 529
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 529
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|