Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1745 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton, Hagenbuch S.B. No. 1745
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2025; March 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 14, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1745 By:  Hinojosa of Hidalgo




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the name, rights, powers, and privileges of the Cedar
 Port Navigation and Improvement District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 3854, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 3854. CEDAR PORT NAVIGATION AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
 [CHAMBERS COUNTY IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1]
 SECTION 2.  Section 3854.001(3), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "District" means the Cedar Port Navigation and
 Improvement District [Chambers County Improvement District No. 1].
 SECTION 3.  Section 3854.002, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 3854.002.  NATURE OF DISTRICT. A special district
 known as the "Cedar Port Navigation and Improvement District"
 ["Chambers County Improvement District No. 1"] is a political
 subdivision of this state.
 SECTION 4.  Section 3854.151, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 3854.151.  GENERAL POWERS.  The district has:
 (1)  all the rights, powers, and privileges conferred
 by the general law of this state applicable to districts created
 under:
 (A)  Chapter 375, Local Government Code;
 (B)  Chapter 172, Transportation Code, or Chapter
 623, Acts of the 67th Legislature, Regular Session, 1981 (former
 Article 6550c, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes);
 (C)  Chapter 441, Transportation Code; and
 (D)  Chapters 49 and [Chapter] 54, Water Code;
 (2)  the rights, powers, and privileges granted to
 districts by:
 (A)  [Subchapters E and M,] Chapter 60, Water
 Code; and
 (B)  Sections [Section] 61.116 and 62.118, Water
 Code; and
 (3)  all the powers granted to municipal management
 districts under Sections 375.092 and 375.111, Local Government
 Code, to provide any services or for any project the district is
 authorized to acquire, construct, or improve under this chapter.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter D, Chapter 3854, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3854.1515 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 3854.1515.  ACTING AS NONFEDERAL SPONSOR. If authorized
 by the United States, notwithstanding Section 60.033, Water Code,
 or any other state law, the district may exercise all rights,
 powers, and privileges necessary to allow the district to act as a
 nonfederal sponsor under a federal project partnership agreement,
 including by operating barges, engaging in dredging, and engaging
 in related maritime operations on water that is not in the territory
 of the district.
 SECTION 6.  Section 3854.153, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 3854.153.  AUTHORITY TO ACQUIRE INTEREST IN LAND. The
 district may acquire any interest in land in accordance with
 Chapter 49, [Chapter] 54, or 60, Water Code.
 SECTION 7.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *