House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Middleton | Journal Page: 1110 |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1090 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 535 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 535 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |