Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1810 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1810
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2025; March 13, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 2, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 2, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1810 By:  Schwertner




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to annual statistical reports for fixing title insurance
 premium rates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2703.153, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (c-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The department shall issue a call for the statistical
 report data required under Subsection (a):
 (1)  to each title insurance agent, not later than
 March 1 of each year for a statistical report due to the department
 on May 1; and
 (2)  to each title insurance company, not later than
 April 1 of each year for a statistical report due to the department
 on June 1.
 (c-1)  The department shall publish on the department's
 Internet website a compilation report summarizing the statistical
 reports submitted under Subsection (a):
 (1)  from all title insurance agents, not later than
 October 1 of each year; and
 (2)  from all title insurance companies, not later than
 November 1 of each year.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a statistical report filed on or after January 1, 2026.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *