House | 05/06/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 992 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Vet Affairs | Journal Page: 536 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 536 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |