House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1563 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |