Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1844 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/29/2025

                            By: Paxton S.B. No. 1844
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2025; March 13, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 29, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 29, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1844 By:  Middleton




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to disannexation of certain areas of a municipality for
 failure to provide services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.141, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a), (b), (d), and (f) and adding
 Subsections (g) and (h) to read as follows:
 (a)  A majority of the property owners [qualified voters] of
 an [annexed] area, including one or more lots, tracts, or parcels,
 or a portion of a lot, tract, or parcel, may petition the governing
 body of the municipality to disannex the area if the municipality
 fails or refuses to provide the services described under Subsection
 (b)(1) or (3) or to cause those services to be provided to the area:
 (1)  if the area was annexed under Subchapter C-1,
 within the period specified by Section 43.056 or by the service plan
 prepared for the area under that section; [or]
 (2)  if the area was annexed under Subchapter C-3, C-4,
 or C-5, within the period specified by the written agreement under
 Section 43.0672 or the resolution under Section 43.0682 or 43.0692,
 as applicable; or
 (3)  notwithstanding Section 43.0505, if the area did
 not become part of the municipality in compliance with and under
 Subchapter C.
 (b)  If the governing body fails or refuses to disannex the
 area within 60 days after the date of the receipt of the petition,
 any one or more of the signers of the petition may bring a cause of
 action in a district court of the county in which the area is
 principally located to request that the area be disannexed.  On the
 filing of an answer by the governing body, and on application of
 either party, the case shall be advanced and heard without further
 delay in accordance with rules for expedited actions under the
 Texas Rules of Civil Procedure.  The district court shall enter an
 order disannexing the area and award attorney's fees to the signers
 of the petition if the court finds that a valid petition was filed
 with the municipality and that the municipality [failed to]:
 (1)  failed to perform its obligations in accordance
 with:
 (A)  the service plan under Section 43.056;
 (B)  the written agreement entered into under
 Section 43.0672; or
 (C)  the resolution adopted under Section 43.0682
 or 43.0692, as applicable; [or]
 (2)  failed to perform in good faith; or
 (3)  has not connected the majority of the properties
 in the area covered by the petition, regardless of whether the area
 was annexed by the municipality, to the municipality's water and
 wastewater systems, if any other area in the municipality is
 connected to the municipality's water and wastewater systems.
 (d)  The petition for disannexation must:
 (1)  be written;
 (2)  request the disannexation;
 (3)  be signed in ink or indelible pencil by the
 appropriate property owners [voters];
 (4)  [be signed by each voter as that person's name
 appears on the most recent official list of registered voters;
 [(5)]  contain a note made by each property owner
 [voter] stating the person's residence address [and the precinct
 number and voter registration number that appear on the person's
 voter registration certificate];
 (5) [(6)]  describe the area to be disannexed and have
 a plat, survey, or other likeness of the area attached; and
 (6) [(7)]  be presented to the secretary of the
 municipality.
 (f)  For an area annexed under this chapter, before [Before]
 the petition is circulated among the property owners [voters],
 notice of the petition must be given by posting a copy of the
 petition for 10 days in three public places in the [annexed] area
 and by publishing a copy of the petition once in a newspaper of
 general circulation serving the area before the 15th day before the
 date the petition is first circulated.  Proof of the posting and
 publication must be made by attaching to the petition presented to
 the secretary:
 (1)  the sworn affidavit of any property owner [voter]
 who signed the petition, stating the places and dates of the
 posting; and
 (2)  the sworn affidavit of the publisher of the
 newspaper in which the notice was published, stating the name of the
 newspaper and the issue and date of publication.
 (g)  If an area described by Subsection (a)(3) is disannexed
 in accordance with this section, the landowners of the area are not
 eligible for a refund of taxes or fees for the area under Section
 43.148.
 (h)  The disannexation of an area under this section may not
 include land that comprises the bed of a navigable waterway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *