House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1371 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1097 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA6 West | Journal Page: 1066 |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA6 West | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA5 West | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1065 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1063 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |