House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1824 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1417 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1417 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1417 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 549 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 549 | |
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |