Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB193 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R3313 EAS-D
 By: Menéndez S.B. No. 193




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a model suicide prevention policy, suicide prevention
 and intervention strategies incorporated into a state agency crisis
 or disaster plan, suicide death information maintained by the
 Department of State Health Services, and the Texas Violent Death
 Reporting System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 547, Government Code, as effective April
 1, 2025, is amended by adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J.  SUICIDE PREVENTION
 Sec. 547.0451.  MODEL SUICIDE PREVENTION POLICY. (a) In
 this section, "postvention" includes activities that promote
 healing necessary to reduce the risk of suicide by an individual
 affected by the suicide of another individual.
 (b)  The commission shall develop and publish on the
 commission's Internet website a model suicide prevention policy to
 be implemented at state agencies, community coalitions, and other
 public or private institutions or facilities that serve populations
 at higher risk for suicide, including veterans, individuals with
 disabilities, and individuals who live in rural areas of this
 state.  The policy must be designed for implementation by
 individuals who may not be mental health professionals.
 (c)  The policy must include:
 (1)  information on suicide prevention, intervention,
 and postvention;
 (2)  information on recognizing warning signs of
 suicide; and
 (3)  resources, including local mental health
 authorities, for individuals at risk of suicide.
 (d)  The policy must address the development of community
 coalitions to engage in suicide prevention, intervention, and
 postvention activities, especially in high-risk rural areas of this
 state.
 (e)  In developing the policy under this section, the
 commission:
 (1)  shall collaborate with the statewide behavioral
 health coordinating council established under Subchapter D and the
 Texas Suicide Prevention Collaborative; and
 (2)  may receive information or assistance from any
 other interested statewide or local entities engaged in suicide
 prevention, intervention, and postvention.
 Sec. 547.0452.  CRISIS AND DISASTER PLANS. (a) Not later
 than August 31, 2026, the commission, in collaboration with the
 Disaster Behavioral Health Consortium, shall:
 (1)  for the purpose of identifying opportunities to
 incorporate suicide prevention, intervention, and postvention
 strategies:
 (A)  conduct a review of crisis plans and disaster
 plans of state agency consortium members; and
 (B)  identify lessons learned from responses by
 state agency consortium members during prior crises or disasters;
 and
 (2)  based on the information obtained under
 Subdivision (1), recommend to each state agency consortium member
 incorporating suicide prevention, intervention, and postvention
 strategies into a crisis plan or disaster plan.
 (b)  Not later than August 1, 2027, each state agency member
 of the Disaster Behavioral Health Consortium shall incorporate
 recommendations the commission made under Subsection (a) into the
 agency's crisis plan or disaster plan.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  Section 191.002(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The department shall:
 (1)  establish a vital statistics unit in the
 department with suitable offices that are properly equipped for the
 preservation of its official records;
 (2)  establish a statewide system of vital statistics;
 (3)  provide instructions and prescribe forms for
 collecting, recording, transcribing, compiling, and preserving
 vital statistics;
 (4)  require the enforcement of this title and rules
 adopted under this title;
 (5)  prepare, print, and supply to local registrars
 forms for registering, recording, and preserving returns or
 otherwise carrying out the purposes of this title; [and]
 (6)  propose legislation necessary for the purposes of
 this title; and
 (7)  provide access to information regarding suicides
 in this state to the statewide suicide prevention coordinator of
 the Health and Human Services Commission's office of mental health
 coordination.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.090 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.090.  TEXAS VIOLENT DEATH REPORTING SYSTEM. (a)
 The department shall establish and operate the Texas Violent Death
 Reporting System for the purpose of participating in the National
 Violent Death Reporting System operated by the Centers for Disease
 Control and Prevention.
 (b)  The department shall provide access to suicide data
 obtained or maintained through the Texas Violent Death Reporting
 System to the statewide suicide prevention coordinator of the
 commission's office of mental health coordination.
 (c)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.