House
|
05/07/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1356
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1242
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3915
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1043
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1043
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1043
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1043
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 557
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|