Senate | 04/23/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1348 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1348 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1348 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |