Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2023 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/14/2025

                            By: Blanco S.B. No. 2023
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2025; March 17, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 14, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 2; April 14, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a grant program to support the
 disposition of deceased paupers' bodies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 694, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 694.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 694.004.  DECEASED PAUPERS GRANT PROGRAM. (a) The
 Health and Human Services Commission may develop a deceased paupers
 grant program to award grants from the deceased paupers grant
 account established by this section to counties for the purpose of
 paying certain costs associated with the disposition of deceased
 paupers' bodies in accordance with Section 694.002.
 (b)  The Health and Human Services Commission may award a
 grant under the grant program to a county to be used for:
 (1)  paying the costs incurred in disposing of deceased
 paupers' bodies in accordance with Section 694.002; and
 (2)  administering the county's body disposition
 activities.
 (c)  The deceased paupers grant account is a dedicated
 account in the general revenue fund and consists of:
 (1)  appropriations of money to the account by the
 legislature;
 (2)  gifts, grants, and other donations received for
 the account; and
 (3)  interest earned on the investment of money in the
 account.
 (d)  Money in the deceased paupers grant account may be used
 by the Health and Human Services Commission only to:
 (1)  award grants under this section; and
 (2)  administer the deceased paupers grant program
 under this section.
 (e)  If the Health and Human Services Commission develops a
 deceased paupers grant program under this section, the executive
 commissioner shall adopt rules for the administration of that
 program.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *