Senate | 05/06/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1478 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote RV#1478 | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2773 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 4130 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2025 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2031 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1859 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |