Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB205 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 20, 2024
Analysis November 20, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 7, 2025
Witness List May 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2025

Analysis

Analysis February 11, 2025