Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB21 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 12, 2025
Analysis February 12, 2025
Bill February 12, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note March 6, 2025
Bill March 6, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 4, 2025
Fiscal Note March 4, 2025
Analysis March 4, 2025
Witness List March 4, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2025
Fiscal Note February 28, 2025
Fiscal Note February 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 4, 2025

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2025
Analysis February 14, 2025