House | 05/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1771 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 681 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 681 | |
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |