Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2025
Analysis March 10, 2025
Fiscal Note March 10, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2025