Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2139 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: King S.B. No. 2139
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2025; March 24, 2025, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ April 28, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11,
5+ Nays 0; April 28, 2025, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49
510
611 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
712 AN ACT
813 relating to the authority of the Texas Military Department to
914 negotiate the release of a reversionary interest and certain other
1015 interests of the state in certain property in Palo Pinto County
1116 owned by the Palo Pinto County Livestock Association.
1217 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1318 SECTION 1. (a) The Texas Military Department shall
1419 determine the fair market value of the property described in
1520 Section 2 of this Act on the date the property was transferred by
1621 the state to the City of Mineral Wells as provided by Senate Bill
1722 197, Acts of the 53rd Legislature, Regular Session, 1953. The Texas
1823 Military Department shall also determine the present fair market
1924 value of interests retained by the state in buildings, structures,
2025 and other property located or installed on the transferred property
2126 as required by that Act. The fair market value of the transferred
2227 property and other property interests may be established by an
2328 independent appraisal obtained by the Texas Military Department or
2429 by another means determined reasonable by the department if an
2530 independent appraisal of that value is not feasible.
2631 (b) Upon determining the fair market value of the property
2732 described in Section 2 of this Act and any buildings, structures, or
2833 other property located or installed on that property, as provided
2934 by Subsection (a) of this section, the Texas Military Department
3035 shall negotiate and close a transaction with the Palo Pinto County
3136 Livestock Association for the release of the state's reversionary
3237 interest in the property described by Section 2 of this Act and any
3338 other interest of the state in buildings, structures, or other
3439 property located or installed on that property.
3540 (c) In negotiating and closing the transaction under
3641 Subsection (b) of this section, the Texas Military Department shall
3742 determine whether the state has received as consideration for the
3843 state's transfer of the property described by Section 2 of this Act
3944 the fair market value of the property, as determined under
4045 Subsection (a) of this section, through the property's use since
4146 its transfer for a fair, livestock show, and rodeo ground in
4247 furtherance of a public purpose of this state, as provided by
4348 covenants imposed in consideration of the transfer. The Texas
4449 Military Department shall also consider whether the state has
4550 received sufficient additional consideration through that use to
4651 equal the present fair market value of buildings, structures, or
4752 other property located or installed on the property described by
4853 Section 2 of this Act to which the state retains title.
4954 (d) If the Texas Military Department determines that the
5055 state has received the fair market value of the property described
5156 by Section 2 of this Act and any buildings, structures, or other
5257 property located or installed on that property, as determined under
5358 Subsection (a) of this section, the department shall by appropriate
5459 instrument release the state's reversionary interest in the
5560 property described by Section 2 of this Act and the state's interest
5661 in any buildings, structures, or other property located or
5762 installed on that property. Otherwise, the department may release
5863 those interests in exchange for sufficient monetary consideration,
5964 as determined by the Texas Military Department, to provide the
6065 remaining value owed to the state for the state's transfer of the
6166 property described by Section 2 of this Act and for any buildings,
6267 structures, or other property installed on that property.
6368 SECTION 2. The real property to which Section 1 of this Act
6469 applies is situated in Palo Pinto County, Texas, and is described
6570 more particularly as follows:
6671 A part of Section 13, Abstract 701, T. & P. R. R. Co. Surveys
6772 East of the Brazos in Palo Pinto County, Texas, and described by
6873 metes and bounds as follows:
6974 BEGINNING at a point on the West line of said Section 13, 1044
7075 feet North of the Southwest corner of said section, said beginning
7176 point being on the West line of a tract of 86.5 acres described as
7277 "First Tract" in a deed dated June 18, 1937, from A. L. Howard and
7378 wife, Virginia Howard, to the State of Texas;
7479 THENCE North with the West line of said section, following
7580 the West line of said 86.5 acre tract and the West line of a 45 acre
7681 tract described as "Third Tract" in the above mentioned deed, a
7782 total distance of 2586 feet to the Northwest corner of said 45
7883 acres;
7984 THENCE East with the North line of said 45 acres 625.8 feet to
8085 corner;
8186 THENCE South 2586 feet to corner;
8287 THENCE West 625.8 feet to place of beginning.
8388 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
8489 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8590 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8691 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8792 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
93+ * * * * *