Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 10, 2025
Analysis March 10, 2025
Bill March 10, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 16, 2025
Witness List April 16, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 9, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2025