Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2269 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+2025S0125-1 02/21/25
12 By: Perry S.B. No. 2269
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2025; March 25, 2025, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4- April 28, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2025,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2269 By: Perry
93
104
115
126
137 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
148 AN ACT
159 relating to dispute resolution for and enforcement actions against
1610 certain long-term care facilities.
1711 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
18- SECTION 1. Section 526.0202, Government Code, is amended by
19- adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
12+ SECTION 1. Section 526.0202, Government Code, as effective
13+ April 1, 2025, is amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
14+ follows:
2015 (b-1) A decision under the informal dispute resolution
2116 process by the contracting person adjudicating a dispute between
2217 the commission and a facility described by Subsection (b) is
23- binding on the commission and cannot be overturned by the
24- commission.
18+ binding and may not be overturned by the commission.
2519 SECTION 2. Section 242.002, Health and Safety Code, is
2620 amended by adding Subdivision (13) to read as follows:
2721 (13) "Retaliate" means an adverse action by the
2822 commission in response to a good faith action by a nursing facility
2923 responding to a commission decision negatively affecting the
3024 nursing facility.
3125 SECTION 3. Section 242.070, Health and Safety Code, is
3226 amended to read as follows:
3327 Sec. 242.070. APPLICATION OF OTHER LAW. (a) The commission
3428 [department] may not assess more than one monetary penalty under
3529 this chapter and Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, for a violation
3630 arising out of the same act or failure to act, except as provided by
3731 Section 242.0665(c). The commission [department] may assess the
3832 greater of a monetary penalty under this chapter or a monetary
3933 penalty under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, for the same act or
4034 failure to act.
4135 (b) The commission may not impose an administrative penalty
4236 under this chapter and Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, against a
4337 nursing facility for a violation arising out of the same act or
4438 failure to act that is the subject of:
4539 (1) a penalty imposed by the Centers for Medicare and
4640 Medicaid Services under 42 C.F.R. Section 488.408 against the
4741 facility; or
4842 (2) a penalty the facility appeals under 42 C.F.R.
4943 Part 498 before the facility exhausts all rights of appeal if:
5044 (A) the federal requirement is the same or
5145 substantially similar to a requirement in this chapter or Chapter
5246 32, Human Resources Code; and
5347 (B) Subdivision (1) does not apply.
5448 SECTION 4. Subchapter C, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
5549 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.075 to read as follows:
5650 Sec. 242.075. PROHIBITED RETALIATION. The commission may
5751 not retaliate against a nursing facility in response to the
5852 facility in good faith appealing a commission decision or filing
5953 another action to counter a commission action against the facility.
6054 SECTION 5. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
6155 a violation that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
6256 A violation that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
6357 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
6458 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
6559 purpose.
6660 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
67- * * * * *