Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2269 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/28/2025

                            By: Perry S.B. No. 2269
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2025; March 25, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 28, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2269 By:  Perry




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to dispute resolution for and enforcement actions against
 certain long-term care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 526.0202, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A decision under the informal dispute resolution
 process by the contracting person adjudicating a dispute between
 the commission and a facility described by Subsection (b) is
 binding on the commission and cannot be overturned by the
 commission.
 SECTION 2.  Section 242.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (13) to read as follows:
 (13)  "Retaliate" means an adverse action by the
 commission in response to a good faith action by a nursing facility
 responding to a commission decision negatively affecting the
 nursing facility.
 SECTION 3.  Section 242.070, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 242.070.  APPLICATION OF OTHER LAW.  (a)  The commission
 [department] may not assess more than one monetary penalty under
 this chapter and Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, for a violation
 arising out of the same act or failure to act, except as provided by
 Section 242.0665(c).  The commission [department] may assess the
 greater of a monetary penalty under this chapter or a monetary
 penalty under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, for the same act or
 failure to act.
 (b)  The commission may not impose an administrative penalty
 under this chapter and Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, against a
 nursing facility for a violation arising out of the same act or
 failure to act that is the subject of:
 (1)  a penalty imposed by the Centers for Medicare and
 Medicaid Services under 42 C.F.R. Section 488.408 against the
 facility; or
 (2)  a penalty the facility appeals under 42 C.F.R.
 Part 498 before the facility exhausts all rights of appeal if:
 (A)  the federal requirement is the same or
 substantially similar to a requirement in this chapter or Chapter
 32, Human Resources Code; and
 (B)  Subdivision (1) does not apply.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 242.075.  PROHIBITED RETALIATION. The commission may
 not retaliate against a nursing facility in response to the
 facility in good faith appealing a commission decision or filing
 another action to counter a commission action against the facility.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a violation that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A violation that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *