1 | 1 | | 89R15684 MM-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Miles S.B. No. 2287 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to the creation of the child-care advisory council. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 301, Labor Code, is amended by adding |
---|
12 | 12 | | Subchapter L to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SUBCHAPTER L. CHILD-CARE ADVISORY COUNCIL |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 301.201. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "advisory |
---|
15 | 15 | | council" means the child-care advisory council. |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 301.202. ESTABLISHMENT. The child-care advisory |
---|
17 | 17 | | council is established to advise the commission regarding |
---|
18 | 18 | | child-care issues. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Sec. 301.203. MEMBERSHIP; TERMS; VACANCY. (a) The |
---|
20 | 20 | | advisory council is composed of the following seven members: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (1) one member who represents the child-care industry, |
---|
22 | 22 | | appointed by the governor; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2) one member who represents the child-care industry, |
---|
24 | 24 | | appointed by the lieutenant governor; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (3) one member who represents the child-care industry, |
---|
26 | 26 | | appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (4) two members who represent local workforce |
---|
28 | 28 | | development boards, appointed by the chair of the commission; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (5) two members who represent the business community, |
---|
30 | 30 | | appointed by the chair of the commission. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (b) Members of the advisory council serve staggered terms of |
---|
32 | 32 | | four years, with the terms of half of the members, or as near to |
---|
33 | 33 | | one-half as possible, expiring November 1 of each odd-numbered |
---|
34 | 34 | | year. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (c) A vacancy on the advisory council shall be filled for |
---|
36 | 36 | | the unexpired term in the same manner as the original appointment. |
---|
37 | 37 | | Sec. 301.204. PRESIDING OFFICER. The members of the |
---|
38 | 38 | | advisory council shall select from among the members a presiding |
---|
39 | 39 | | officer of the council. |
---|
40 | 40 | | Sec. 301.205. COUNCIL MEETINGS. (a) The advisory council |
---|
41 | 41 | | shall meet two times each year at the call of the presiding officer. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (b) A majority of the voting members of the advisory council |
---|
43 | 43 | | constitutes a quorum. |
---|
44 | 44 | | Sec. 301.206. ADMINISTRATIVE AND STAFF SUPPORT. The |
---|
45 | 45 | | commission shall provide administrative and staff support for the |
---|
46 | 46 | | advisory council. |
---|
47 | 47 | | Sec. 301.207. COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. |
---|
48 | 48 | | A member of the advisory council is not entitled to compensation for |
---|
49 | 49 | | service as a member of the advisory council but is entitled to |
---|
50 | 50 | | reimbursement for actual and necessary travel expenses incurred in |
---|
51 | 51 | | performing functions as a member of the advisory council, as |
---|
52 | 52 | | provided in the General Appropriations Act. |
---|
53 | 53 | | Sec. 301.208. REPORT. The advisory council shall prepare |
---|
54 | 54 | | and provide a report to the legislature not later than January 1 of |
---|
55 | 55 | | each odd-numbered year. |
---|
56 | 56 | | Sec. 301.209. APPLICATION OF OTHER LAW. Chapter 2110, |
---|
57 | 57 | | Government Code, does not apply to the advisory council. |
---|
58 | 58 | | SECTION 2. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective |
---|
59 | 59 | | date of this Act but not later than November 1, 2025, the |
---|
60 | 60 | | appropriate appointing authorities shall appoint the initial |
---|
61 | 61 | | members to the child-care advisory council as required by Section |
---|
62 | 62 | | 301.203, Labor Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
63 | 63 | | (b) The initial members of the child-care advisory council |
---|
64 | 64 | | shall determine by lot which three initial members of the council |
---|
65 | 65 | | will serve terms that expire November 1, 2027, and which four |
---|
66 | 66 | | members will serve terms that expire November 1, 2029. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (c) Not later than December 1, 2025, the child-care advisory |
---|
68 | 68 | | council established under Subchapter L, Chapter 301, Labor Code, as |
---|
69 | 69 | | added by this Act, shall hold its initial meeting. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|