Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2287 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R15684 MM-D
 By: Miles S.B. No. 2287




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the child-care advisory council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 301, Labor Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter L to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER L. CHILD-CARE ADVISORY COUNCIL
 Sec. 301.201.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "advisory
 council" means the child-care advisory council.
 Sec. 301.202.  ESTABLISHMENT. The child-care advisory
 council is established to advise the commission regarding
 child-care issues.
 Sec. 301.203.  MEMBERSHIP; TERMS; VACANCY. (a) The
 advisory council is composed of the following seven members:
 (1)  one member who represents the child-care industry,
 appointed by the governor;
 (2)  one member who represents the child-care industry,
 appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  one member who represents the child-care industry,
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (4)  two members who represent local workforce
 development boards, appointed by the chair of the commission; and
 (5)  two members who represent the business community,
 appointed by the chair of the commission.
 (b)  Members of the advisory council serve staggered terms of
 four years, with the terms of half of the members, or as near to
 one-half as possible, expiring November 1 of each odd-numbered
 year.
 (c)  A vacancy on the advisory council shall be filled for
 the unexpired term in the same manner as the original appointment.
 Sec. 301.204.  PRESIDING OFFICER.  The members of the
 advisory council shall select from among the members a presiding
 officer of the council.
 Sec. 301.205.  COUNCIL MEETINGS.  (a)  The advisory council
 shall meet two times each year at the call of the presiding officer.
 (b)  A majority of the voting members of the advisory council
 constitutes a quorum.
 Sec. 301.206.  ADMINISTRATIVE AND STAFF SUPPORT. The
 commission shall provide administrative and staff support for the
 advisory council.
 Sec. 301.207.  COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES.
 A member of the advisory council is not entitled to compensation for
 service as a member of the advisory council but is entitled to
 reimbursement for actual and necessary travel expenses incurred in
 performing functions as a member of the advisory council, as
 provided in the General Appropriations Act.
 Sec. 301.208.  REPORT. The advisory council shall prepare
 and provide a report to the legislature not later than January 1 of
 each odd-numbered year.
 Sec. 301.209.  APPLICATION OF OTHER LAW. Chapter 2110,
 Government Code, does not apply to the advisory council.
 SECTION 2.  (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act but not later than November 1, 2025, the
 appropriate appointing authorities shall appoint the initial
 members to the child-care advisory council as required by Section
 301.203, Labor Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The initial members of the child-care advisory council
 shall determine by lot which three initial members of the council
 will serve terms that expire November 1, 2027, and which four
 members will serve terms that expire November 1, 2029.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2025, the child-care advisory
 council established under Subchapter L, Chapter 301, Labor Code, as
 added by this Act, shall hold its initial meeting.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.