House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2033 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1420 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Gutierrez | Journal Page: 1419 |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1419 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1419 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 479 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 95 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 95 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |