Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis November 25, 2024
Fiscal Note November 25, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 14, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025
Bill April 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 13, 2025
Fiscal Note April 3, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2025
Analysis April 1, 2025