Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 13, 2025
Analysis March 13, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2025
Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Analysis April 28, 2025
Witness List April 28, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2025
Analysis March 28, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025