Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2422 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/28/2025

                            By: Hall, Sparks S.B. No. 2422
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; March 25, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 28, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 28, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2422 By:  Perry




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to investigations and disciplinary or punitive action by
 the Texas Medical Board regarding certain treatments or practices
 regarding COVID-19 and to the required expungement of certain
 records.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 153, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 153.017 to read as follows:
 Sec. 153.017.  LIMITATION ON INVESTIGATIVE AND DISCIPLINARY
 AUTHORITY. Notwithstanding any other law, the board may not
 investigate or take disciplinary or other punitive action against a
 person regulated by the board for:
 (1)  prescribing or advocating for the use of
 ivermectin, hydroxychloroquine, or budesonide in the prevention or
 treatment of COVID-19;
 (2)  making statements regarding the efficacy of masks
 in preventing the transmission of COVID-19; or
 (3)  failing to wear or require others to wear masks
 intended to prevent the transmission of COVID-19 in connection with
 the person's practice, other than in areas where it was customary to
 wear masks before the COVID-19 pandemic.
 SECTION 2.  Notwithstanding any other law and not later than
 December 1, 2025, the Texas Medical Board shall:
 (1)  review its records and expunge any record created
 on or after January 1, 2020, related to the investigation of or
 disciplinary or other punitive action taken against a person
 regulated by the board if the record contains any of the following
 words:
 (A)  budesonide;
 (B)  hydroxychloroquine;
 (C)  ivermectin; or
 (D)  mask; and
 (2)  in connection with each record expunged under
 Subdivision (1), vacate any disciplinary action imposed and rescind
 any other punitive action taken by the board.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *