Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2452 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/01/2025

                            By: Hancock S.B. No. 2452
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; March 25, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 May 1, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 1, 2025, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2452 By:  Middleton




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compensation of the chief appraiser of an appraisal
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 6.05(d), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Section 6.0501, the chief
 appraiser is entitled to compensation as provided by the budget
 adopted by the board of directors. No portion of the [The] chief
 appraiser's compensation may [not] be directly or indirectly linked
 to the expectation of an increase in the total market, appraised, or
 taxable value of property in the appraisal district.  Except as
 provided by Section 6.0501, the chief appraiser may employ and
 compensate professional, clerical, and other personnel as provided
 by the budget, with the exception of a general counsel to the
 appraisal district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *