House | 05/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3275 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1811 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1811 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1811 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1810 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1810 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1810 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 96 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 96 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |