Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB250 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis November 20, 2024
Fiscal Note November 20, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 30, 2025
Bill April 30, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2025