House | 05/07/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1737 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1737 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1737 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hughes | Journal Page: 1736 |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |