Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2514 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 05/05/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hughes S.B. No. 2514




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing the hostile foreign adversaries unit at
 the Department of Public Safety and training, prohibitions, and
 reporting requirements designed to combat foreign influence and
 foreign adversary operations; creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 411, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter S to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER S. HOSTILE FOREIGN ADVERSARIES UNIT
 Sec. 411.551.  DEFINITIONS.  In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Foreign adversary operation" means actions by
 adversarial foreign governments that threaten the safety and
 security of this state.
 (2)  "Unit" means the department's hostile foreign
 adversaries unit established under this subchapter.
 Sec. 411.552.  HOSTILE FOREIGN ADVERSARIES UNIT. The
 hostile foreign adversaries unit is established in the department
 to support the department's duty to prevent the harassment and
 coercion of this state's residents from foreign adversary
 operations, strengthen state agencies against foreign adversary
 operations, and protect this state's critical infrastructure
 against threats foreign adversary operations pose.
 Sec. 411.553.  UNIT EMPLOYEES.  The director may appoint
 unit employees as necessary to perform unit functions.
 Sec. 411.554.  BIENNIAL REPORT. (a) Not later than December
 1 of each even-numbered year, the unit shall submit to the governor
 and the legislature a written report that assesses the threat
 foreign adversary operations posed to this state, including to this
 state's residents and governmental units, during the preceding two
 years. The report must include:
 (1)  an assessment of the incidence of foreign
 adversary operations conducted in this state, including operations
 intended to influence political sentiment or public discourse; and
 (2)  strategies that have proven effective to combat
 the operations described by Subdivision (1).
 (b)  On request by the unit, a state agency or a local law
 enforcement agency shall provide to the unit information relating
 to any foreign adversary operation that the agency has researched
 or investigated or otherwise holds relevant information on.
 Sec. 411.555.  ADDITIONAL DUTIES. (a) The unit shall
 collaborate with local governments and federal agencies to operate
 the Texas Fusion Center.
 (b)  The unit shall refer for prosecution to the appropriate
 prosecuting attorney cases in which individuals or organizations
 have engaged in or assisted in foreign adversary operations in this
 state.
 Sec. 411.556.  SECURE STORAGE OF SENSITIVE INFORMATION. (a)
 The unit shall provide for the secure storage of sensitive
 information obtained or produced as part of the report developed
 under Section 411.554.
 (b)  Information determined as sensitive under Subsection
 (a) is not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552.
 Sec. 411.557.  INFORMATION SHARING. With the approval of
 the director, the unit may share information determined sensitive
 under Section 411.556(a) with another federal, state, or local law
 enforcement agency. The disclosure of information under this
 section is not a voluntary disclosure under Section 552.007.
 Sec. 411.558.  RULES. The commission may adopt rules to
 implement this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 572, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 572.070 to read as follows:
 Sec. 572.070.  PROHIBITIONS AND REPORTING REQUIREMENTS
 RELATED TO FOREIGN INFLUENCE; CRIMINAL OFFENSE. (a) In this
 section, "foreign adversary" means a country:
 (1)  identified by the United States Director of
 National Intelligence as a country that poses a risk to the national
 security of the United States in at least one of the three most
 recent Annual Threat Assessments of the U.S. Intelligence Community
 issued pursuant to Section 108B, National Security Act of 1947 (50
 U.S.C. Section 3043b); or
 (2)  designated by the governor after consultation with
 the public safety director of the Department of Public Safety.
 (b)  An employee or volunteer of a state agency or a
 political subdivision of this state may not:
 (1)  accept transportation to or lodging in a country
 that is a foreign adversary and that is paid for by the foreign
 adversary because of the employee's or volunteer's position with
 the state or political subdivision; or
 (2)  accept a gift or item of value from a person
 representing a foreign adversary for any purpose, including to pay
 for travel expenses or as reimbursement for the costs of attending a
 conference or other event in a country that is a foreign adversary
 or that is hosted on behalf of a foreign adversary or a principal of
 a foreign adversary.
 (c)  An employee or volunteer of a state agency or a
 political subdivision of this state shall report to the commission,
 in the form and manner the commission requires, each interaction,
 communication, or meeting the employee or volunteer has with a
 person acting on behalf of a foreign adversary not later than the
 30th day after the date of the interaction, communication, or
 meeting. The commission shall make available a report under this
 subsection to the attorney general and the Texas Department of
 Public Safety on request.
 (d)  A person commits an offense if the person knowingly
 violates this section. An offense under this subsection is a state
 jail felony.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2054.519, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows:
 (f)  In addition to the requirements for certification under
 Subsection (b), a cybersecurity training program must include
 education on:
 (1)  the threat of foreign adversaries and other
 hostile foreign actors, including the United Front Work Department
 of the Central Committee of the Chinese Communist Party and other
 coordinated foreign influence operations;
 (2)  known efforts by foreign adversaries to target and
 influence subnational governments, including efforts made by the
 United Front Work Department;
 (3)  identifying and recognizing suspected foreign
 influence operations;
 (4)  informational resources promulgated by federal,
 state, and nongovernmental organizations on United Front Work
 Department activities in this state and adjacent states; and
 (5)  reporting to the Texas Ethics Commission as
 required by Section 572.070 and to law enforcement agencies
 suspected foreign influence operations and other interactions with
 persons acting on behalf of a foreign adversary.
 (g)  In Subsection (f), "foreign adversary" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 572.070.
 SECTION 4.  Section 572.070(c), Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to an interaction, communication, or meeting with
 a person acting on behalf of a foreign adversary that occurs on or
 after March 1, 2025. A person required to report an interaction,
 communication, or meeting under that section that occurred before
 the effective date of this Act shall make the report not later than
 the 30th day after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2025, the
 Department of Information Resources shall adopt rules implementing
 the certification requirements of Section 2054.519(f), Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Section 2054.519(f), Government Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to the certification of a cybersecurity training
 program under that section that occurs on or after May 1, 2026.  The
 certification of a cybersecurity training program under that
 section that occurs before May 1, 2026, is governed by the law in
 effect on the date of the certification, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.