Senate | 05/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1779 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1799 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 910 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 910 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |