Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2540 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2025

                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 2540
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
 April 22, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the terms of certain agreements involving minor
 boundary adjustments between two contiguous school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.231, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections  (c)  and  (d)  to read as follows:
 (c)  An agreement executed under this section on or after
 January 1, 2025, must include, if applicable:
 (1)  any term or terms of the agreement, including
 restrictions, covenants, or contracts, that will continue to apply
 in force and effect with respect to the real property in the
 territory following the transfer of that territory from one school
 district to the other; and
 (2)  a brief explanation of the privileges, rights, and
 responsibilities of each school district with respect to a term
 described under Subdivision (1).
 (d)  For an agreement executed under this section on or after
 January 1, 2025, but before the effective date of this Act, a term
 described under Subsection (c)(1) is effective as of January 1,
 2025, or a subsequent date agreed to by the parties.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *