Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2540 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2025
Analysis March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 13, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2025