| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read |
---|
| 3 | + | first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16; |
---|
| 4 | + | April 22, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, |
---|
| 5 | + | Nays 0; April 22, 2025, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
2 | 7 | | |
---|
3 | 8 | | |
---|
4 | 9 | | |
---|
5 | 10 | | |
---|
6 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
7 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
8 | 13 | | relating to the terms of certain agreements involving minor |
---|
9 | 14 | | boundary adjustments between two contiguous school districts. |
---|
10 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 13.231, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
12 | 17 | | adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 18 | | (c) An agreement executed under this section on or after |
---|
14 | 19 | | January 1, 2025, must include, if applicable: |
---|
15 | 20 | | (1) any term or terms of the agreement, including |
---|
16 | 21 | | restrictions, covenants, or contracts, that will continue to apply |
---|
17 | 22 | | in force and effect with respect to the real property in the |
---|
18 | 23 | | territory following the transfer of that territory from one school |
---|
19 | 24 | | district to the other; and |
---|
20 | 25 | | (2) a brief explanation of the privileges, rights, and |
---|
21 | 26 | | responsibilities of each school district with respect to a term |
---|
22 | 27 | | described under Subdivision (1). |
---|
23 | 28 | | (d) For an agreement executed under this section on or after |
---|
24 | 29 | | January 1, 2025, but before the effective date of this Act, a term |
---|
25 | 30 | | described under Subsection (c)(1) is effective as of January 1, |
---|
26 | 31 | | 2025, or a subsequent date agreed to by the parties. |
---|
27 | 32 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|