Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2541 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+89R12969 PRL-D
12 By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 2541
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
4- April 29, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 2; April 29, 2025,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2541 By: Paxton
93
104
115
126
137 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
148 AN ACT
15- relating to the calculation of the unused increment rate of a taxing
16- unit.
9+ relating to the repeal of provisions providing for the calculation
10+ of an unused increment rate and the use of that rate in calculating
11+ certain other ad valorem tax rates.
1712 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
18- SECTION 1. Sections 26.013(a)(3) and (4), Tax Code, are
13+ SECTION 1. Section 26.04(c), Tax Code, is amended to read as
14+ follows:
15+ (c) After the assessor for the taxing unit submits the
16+ appraisal roll for the taxing unit to the governing body of the
17+ taxing unit as required by Subsection (b), an officer or employee
18+ designated by the governing body shall calculate the no-new-revenue
19+ tax rate and the voter-approval tax rate for the taxing unit, where:
20+ (1) "No-new-revenue tax rate" means a rate expressed
21+ in dollars per $100 of taxable value calculated according to the
22+ following formula:
23+ NO-NEW-REVENUE TAX RATE = (LAST YEAR'S LEVY - LOST PROPERTY
24+ LEVY) / (CURRENT TOTAL VALUE - NEW PROPERTY VALUE)
25+ ; and
26+ (2) "Voter-approval tax rate" means a rate expressed
27+ in dollars per $100 of taxable value calculated according to the
28+ following applicable formula:
29+ (A) for a special taxing unit:
30+ VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE = (NO-NEW-REVENUE MAINTENANCE AND
31+ OPERATIONS RATE x 1.08) + CURRENT DEBT RATE
32+ ; or
33+ (B) for a taxing unit other than a special taxing
34+ unit:
35+ VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE = (NO-NEW-REVENUE MAINTENANCE AND
36+ OPERATIONS RATE x 1.035) + [(]CURRENT DEBT RATE [+ UNUSED INCREMENT
37+ RATE)]
38+ SECTION 2. Sections 26.041(a), (b), and (c), Tax Code, are
1939 amended to read as follows:
20- (3) "Year 1" means the second [third] tax year
21- preceding the current tax year.
22- (4) "Year 2" means the [second] tax year preceding the
23- current tax year.
24- SECTION 2. Section 26.013(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
25- as follows:
26- (b) In this chapter, "unused increment rate" means the
27- greater of:
28- (1) zero; or
29- (2) the rate expressed in dollars per $100 of taxable
30- value calculated according to the following formula:
31- UNUSED INCREMENT RATE = (YEAR 1 FOREGONE REVENUE AMOUNT +
32- YEAR 2 FOREGONE REVENUE AMOUNT [+ YEAR 3 FOREGONE REVENUE AMOUNT]) /
33- CURRENT TOTAL VALUE
34- SECTION 3. Section 26.013(a)(5), Tax Code, is repealed.
35- SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
36- the calculation of the unused increment rate, as defined by Section
37- 26.013, Tax Code, as amended by this Act, for a tax year that begins
38- on or after January 1, 2027. The calculation of the unused
39- increment rate for a tax year that begins before January 1, 2027, is
40- governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
41- of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
42- purpose.
43- SECTION 5. This Act takes effect January 1, 2026.
44- * * * * *
40+ (a) In the first year in which an additional sales and use
41+ tax is required to be collected, the no-new-revenue tax rate and
42+ voter-approval tax rate for the taxing unit are calculated
43+ according to the following formulas:
44+ NO-NEW-REVENUE TAX RATE = [(LAST YEAR'S LEVY - LOST PROPERTY
45+ LEVY) / (CURRENT TOTAL VALUE - NEW PROPERTY VALUE)] - SALES TAX GAIN
46+ RATE
47+ and
48+ VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE FOR SPECIAL TAXING UNIT =
49+ (NO-NEW-REVENUE MAINTENANCE AND OPERATIONS RATE x 1.08) + (CURRENT
50+ DEBT RATE - SALES TAX GAIN RATE)
51+ or
52+ VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE FOR TAXING UNIT OTHER THAN SPECIAL
53+ TAXING UNIT = (NO-NEW-REVENUE MAINTENANCE AND OPERATIONS RATE x
54+ 1.035) + (CURRENT DEBT RATE [+ UNUSED INCREMENT RATE] - SALES TAX
55+ GAIN RATE)
56+ where "sales tax gain rate" means a number expressed in dollars per
57+ $100 of taxable value, calculated by dividing the revenue that will
58+ be generated by the additional sales and use tax in the following
59+ year as calculated under Subsection (d) by the current total value.
60+ (b) Except as provided by Subsections (a) and (c), in a year
61+ in which a taxing unit imposes an additional sales and use tax, the
62+ voter-approval tax rate for the taxing unit is calculated according
63+ to the following formula, regardless of whether the taxing unit
64+ levied a property tax in the preceding year:
65+ VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE FOR SPECIAL TAXING UNIT = [(LAST
66+ YEAR'S MAINTENANCE AND OPERATIONS EXPENSE x 1.08) / (CURRENT TOTAL
67+ VALUE - NEW PROPERTY VALUE)] + (CURRENT DEBT RATE - SALES TAX
68+ REVENUE RATE)
69+ or
70+ VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE FOR TAXING UNIT OTHER THAN SPECIAL
71+ TAXING UNIT = [(LAST YEAR'S MAINTENANCE AND OPERATIONS EXPENSE x
72+ 1.035) / (CURRENT TOTAL VALUE - NEW PROPERTY VALUE)] + (CURRENT DEBT
73+ RATE [+ UNUSED INCREMENT RATE] - SALES TAX REVENUE RATE)
74+ where "last year's maintenance and operations expense" means the
75+ amount spent for maintenance and operations from property tax and
76+ additional sales and use tax revenues in the preceding year, and
77+ "sales tax revenue rate" means a number expressed in dollars per
78+ $100 of taxable value, calculated by dividing the revenue that will
79+ be generated by the additional sales and use tax in the current year
80+ as calculated under Subsection (d) by the current total value.
81+ (c) In a year in which a taxing unit that has been imposing
82+ an additional sales and use tax ceases to impose an additional sales
83+ and use tax, the no-new-revenue tax rate and voter-approval tax
84+ rate for the taxing unit are calculated according to the following
85+ formulas:
86+ NO-NEW-REVENUE TAX RATE = [(LAST YEAR'S LEVY - LOST PROPERTY
87+ LEVY) / (CURRENT TOTAL VALUE - NEW PROPERTY VALUE)] + SALES TAX LOSS
88+ RATE
89+ and
90+ VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE FOR SPECIAL TAXING UNIT = [(LAST
91+ YEAR'S MAINTENANCE AND OPERATIONS EXPENSE x 1.08) / (CURRENT TOTAL
92+ VALUE - NEW PROPERTY VALUE)] + CURRENT DEBT RATE
93+ or
94+ VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE FOR TAXING UNIT OTHER THAN SPECIAL
95+ TAXING UNIT = [(LAST YEAR'S MAINTENANCE AND OPERATIONS EXPENSE x
96+ 1.035) / (CURRENT TOTAL VALUE - NEW PROPERTY VALUE)] + [(]CURRENT
97+ DEBT RATE [+ UNUSED INCREMENT RATE)]
98+ where "sales tax loss rate" means a number expressed in dollars per
99+ $100 of taxable value, calculated by dividing the amount of sales
100+ and use tax revenue generated in the last four quarters for which
101+ the information is available by the current total value and "last
102+ year's maintenance and operations expense" means the amount spent
103+ for maintenance and operations from property tax and additional
104+ sales and use tax revenues in the preceding year.
105+ SECTION 3. Sections 49.23602(a)(2) and (4), Water Code, are
106+ amended to read as follows:
107+ (2) "Mandatory tax election rate" means [the rate
108+ equal to the sum of the following tax rates for the district:
109+ [(A)] the rate that would impose 1.035 times the
110+ amount of tax imposed by the district in the preceding year on a
111+ residence homestead appraised at the average appraised value of a
112+ residence homestead in the district in that year, disregarding any
113+ homestead exemption available only to disabled persons or persons
114+ 65 years of age or older[; and
115+ [(B) the unused increment rate].
116+ (4) "Voter-approval tax rate" means the rate equal to
117+ the sum of the following tax rates for the district:
118+ (A) the current year's debt service tax rate;
119+ (B) the current year's contract tax rate; and
120+ (C) the operation and maintenance tax rate that
121+ would impose 1.035 times the amount of the operation and
122+ maintenance tax imposed by the district in the preceding year on a
123+ residence homestead appraised at the average appraised value of a
124+ residence homestead in the district in that year, disregarding any
125+ homestead exemption available only to disabled persons or persons
126+ 65 years of age or older[; and
127+ [(D) the unused increment rate].
128+ SECTION 4. The following provisions are repealed:
129+ (1) Section 120.007(d), Local Government Code;
130+ (2) Section 26.013, Tax Code;
131+ (3) Section 26.0501(c), Tax Code; and
132+ (4) Section 49.23602(a)(3), Water Code.
133+ SECTION 5. This Act applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed
134+ for an ad valorem tax year that begins on or after the effective
135+ date of this Act.
136+ SECTION 6. This Act takes effect January 1, 2026.