House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2753 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2647 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1693 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1693 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1693 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1692 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1554 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Vet Affairs | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |