Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2624 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/08/2025 9:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
03/31/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 S Printed in full
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
03/31/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Left pending in committee