Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2675 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/01/2025

                            By: Hinojosa of Hidalgo S.B. No. 2675
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2025; April 3, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 May 1, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 1, 2025, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2675 By:  West




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the conveyance of certain park land owned by certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 253.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (m) to read as follows:
 (m)  Subsection (b) does not apply to a conveyance of park
 land:
 (1)  owned by a municipality with a population of at
 least 140,000 that is located in a county that:
 (A)  has a population of at least 800,000;
 (B)  is located on an international border; and
 (C)  does not have a municipality with a
 population of more than 500,000 located in the county;
 (2)  located within one mile of a convention facility
 owned by the municipality; and
 (3)  authorized to be conveyed by a resolution or
 ordinance adopted by the governing body of the municipality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *