House | 05/05/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2033 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1855 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1305 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 97 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 97 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |