House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2036 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2036 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1454 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Menndez | Journal Page: 1453 |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1453 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |