LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB28
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB28
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB28
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/06/2025
10:30 am
Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
SB650
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB3667
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB3201
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB1184
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB1800
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
05/06/2025
10:30 am
Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
SB650
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB3667
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB3201
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB1184
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB1800
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
02/27/2025
Senate Notice of Intent Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SB26
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
02/27/2025
Senate Floor Action Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SR131
Introduced
Last Action: 02/27/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR168
Introduced
Last Action: 02/27/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR174
Introduced
Last Action: 02/27/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR175
Introduced
Last Action: 02/27/2025 S Reported enrolled
02/27/2025
Senate Regular Order of Business Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SJR36
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 01/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Jan 28 2025 11:21AM
SB616
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed
SB565
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
SB384
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Signed in the House
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
02/26/2025
Senate Notice of Intent Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SB26
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
02/26/2025
Senate Regular Order of Business Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SJR36
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 01/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Jan 28 2025 11:21AM
SB26
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
SB616
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed
SB565
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
SB384
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Signed in the House
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
02/25/2025
Senate Regular Order of Business Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SJR36
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 01/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Jan 28 2025 11:21AM
SB26
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
SB616
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed
SB565
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
SB384
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Signed in the House
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
02/24/2025
2:00 pm
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
Senate Chamber
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB687
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
SJR34
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Mar 25 2025 3:26PM
SCR9
Introduced
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB523
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB62
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 03/13/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
SB847
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
SB706
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB869
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
SB890
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB992
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
02/20/2025
Senate Floor Action Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SJR5
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Mar 25 2025 3:26PM
SR105
Introduced
Last Action: 02/20/2025 S Reported enrolled
SR121
Introduced
Last Action: 02/20/2025 S Printed in full
SB17
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
SB19
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Mar 25 2025 3:26PM
SB25
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
02/20/2025
Senate Bills Referred Today Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SB17
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
SB19
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Mar 25 2025 3:26PM
SB25
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB28
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .