Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2835 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2025
Fiscal Note March 14, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Analysis May 1, 2025
Witness List May 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note April 22, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2025
Analysis April 22, 2025