Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2835 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/01/2025

                            By: Johnson S.B. No. 2835
 (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2025; April 7, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 May 1, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 1, 2025, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2835 By:  Cook




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal regulation of stairway requirements in
 certain apartment buildings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 214, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter I to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER I.  SINGLE STAIRWAY IN CERTAIN APARTMENT BUILDINGS
 Sec. 214.301.  PERMITTED REGULATION OF APARTMENT BUILDING
 STAIRWAY REQUIREMENTS. (a) A municipality may exercise the
 authority under this section regardless of whether the municipality
 has adopted local amendments to the International Building Code
 under Section 214.216(c).
 (b)  A municipality may authorize an apartment building to
 have a single stairway only if the building:
 (1)  does not have more than six stories above grade
 plane and is not a high-rise as defined by the International
 Building Code, as adopted under Section 214.216;
 (2)  does not have more than four dwelling units on any
 floor;
 (3)  has automatic sprinkler locations in each interior
 exit stairway, regardless of the type of stairway construction,
 that comply with the requirements prescribed by National Fire
 Protection Association Standard 13 for combustible stairways;
 (4)  has:
 (A)  an exterior stairway; or
 (B)  an interior exit stairway for which the
 doors:
 (i)  into the stairway from the interior of
 the building swing into the stairway regardless of the occupant
 load served; and
 (ii)  from the interior exit stairway to the
 building exterior swing in the direction of exit travel;
 (5)  has interior exit stairway enclosures that:
 (A)  have a fire resistance rating of not less
 than two hours; and
 (B)  do not contain an elevator opening;
 (6)  has on each floor a corridor from each dwelling
 unit entry or exit door to an interior exit stairway, including any
 related exit passageway, that has a fire resistance rating of at
 least one hour;
 (7)  does not have more than 20 feet between the entry
 or exit door of a dwelling unit and an exit stairway;
 (8)  does not have more than 125 feet of exit access
 travel distance;
 (9)  has an exit serving the portion of the building
 that contains two or more dwelling units that does not discharge
 through a portion of the building with a different occupancy
 category, including an accessory parking garage;
 (10)  has an exit that terminates in an egress court for
 which the court depth does not exceed the court width, unless it is
 possible to exit the egress court to the public way in either
 direction;
 (11)  does not have an opening within 10 feet of an
 unprotected opening into an exit stairway other than a required
 exit door that has a fire resistance rating of at least one hour;
 (12)  has emergency escape and rescue openings that
 comply with Section 1031 of the International Building Code as
 adopted under Section 214.216 on each floor served by a single exit;
 (13)  does not have an electrical receptacle in an
 interior exit stairway; and
 (14)  has an automatic smoke and fire detection system
 that activates an occupant notification system that complies with
 Section 907.5 of the International Building Code as adopted under
 Section 214.216 installed in each:
 (A)  common space outside of a dwelling unit;
 (B)  laundry room, mechanical equipment room, and
 storage room;
 (C)  interior corridor serving a dwelling unit;
 and
 (D)  main floor landing or interior or exterior
 exit stairway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *