House | 05/06/2025 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2851 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1726 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1726 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1726 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1725 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1725 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Perry | Journal Page: 1724 |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |