Senate | 04/01/2025 | Withdrawn by the Author | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 99 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 99 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |