House | 05/06/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2457 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2264 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1521 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1521 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1521 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 980 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |